U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-mj-07534/A-JR-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vasquez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Exhibit List ]
  • May 13, 2025: [Amended Minute Entry]
  • May 13, 2025: [Witness List]
  • May 13, 2025: [Identity/Removal Hearing - Rule 5(c)(3) ]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • May 08, 2025: [Detention Hearing (Text Only)]
  • May 08, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
  • May 07, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 07, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 07, 2025: [~Util - Interpreter Language (Calendars)]
  • May 07, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • May 07, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 05, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA 23]
  • April 30, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
  • April 30, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Rule 5(c)(3)]
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util - Interpreter Language (Calendars)]
  • April 30, 2025: [Arrest - Rule 40 ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.