U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-mj-04163-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lopez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • May 08, 2025: [Commitment to Another District]
  • May 08, 2025: [Detention Hearing (Text Only)]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 05, 2025: [Release from Custody ]
  • May 02, 2025: [Identity/Removal Hearing - Rule 5(c)(3) ]
  • May 02, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Rule 5(c)(3)]
  • May 02, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 02, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
  • May 02, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Rule 5(c)(3)]
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 30, 2025: [Arrest - Rule 40 ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.