U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-mj-04166-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Meade et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • May 13, 2025: [Amended Minute Entry]
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution - FPD]
  • May 07, 2025: [~Util - Interpreter Language (Calendars)]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • May 07, 2025: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 07, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 07, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 06, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • May 06, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • May 06, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 06, 2025: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 06, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA 23]
  • May 06, 2025: [Amended Minute Entry]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Interpreter Language (Calendars)]
  • May 01, 2025: [Brady Order - Phoenix]
  • May 01, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 01, 2025: [Complaint]
  • May 01, 2025: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.