U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-bk-14364
  • Case Name: Sheila Michelle Wurm-Mitchell
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Close Bankruptcy Case]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • December 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Discharging Debtor(s)]
October, 2017
  • October 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • October 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Financial Management Course (Form 423) - Debtor Education]
August, 2017
  • August 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Creditor Request for Notice]
  • August 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • August 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • August 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [none]
  • August 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [none]
  • August 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Credit Counseling Certificate]
  • August 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Credit Counseling Certificate]
  • August 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • August 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.