open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas
    Case Number:5:19-cr-50005-1
    Party Name:USA v. Casby
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Entry]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Reasons]
    Date Published:July 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:July 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:July 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Presentence Investigation Report - FINAL]
    Date Published:June 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [PSR Sentencing Recommendation - USPO]
    Date Published:June 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response/Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:May 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order re Sentencing Memorandum Due (after Initial PSR) - TLB]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Presentence Investigation Report - INITIAL]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:March 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:March 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:March 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:March 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:March 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment - TEXT ONLY]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Unsealed]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Report]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.arwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?56053
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =