open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

ARKANSAS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas
    Case Number:4:19-bk-14796
    Party Name:Jinna Ellington
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dowden, James F. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:January 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dowden, James F. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:December 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dowden, James F. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dowden, James F. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
    Date Published:October 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dowden, James F. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dowden, James F. [none]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dowden, James F. [Chapter 7 Final Payment in FULL]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dowden, James F. [Personal Financial Mgt Course Certificate]
    Date Published:October 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dowden, James F. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dowden, James F. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dowden, James F. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dowden, James F. [Credit Counseling Certificate]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dowden, James F. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dowden, James F. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dowden, James F. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Application / Motion)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.areb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?286681
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =