open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

ARKANSAS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas
    Case Number:1:19-cv-01037
    Party Name:Glover v. Dolgencorp, LLC
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
    Date Published:October 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Stay]
    Date Published:October 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:October 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stay]
    Date Published:October 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:September 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Requested]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Magistrate Notice/Consent Form]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.arwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?58239
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =