open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

ARKANSAS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas
    Case Number:4:19-cv-04115
    Party Name:Craven v. Neeley's Service Center, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum Brief in Support]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certify Collective Action]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Final Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
    Date Published:November 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:October 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement - Filed by Attorney]
    Date Published:October 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint (Attorney filed Complaint)]
    Date Published:October 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:October 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:October 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Magistrate Notice/Consent Form]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Requested]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.arwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?58238
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =