open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

ARKANSAS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas
    Case Number:6:20-cv-06031
    Party Name:Counts v. Woodall et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:April 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:April 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause - Failure to Obey Order-TEXT ONLY]
    Date Published:April 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:March 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection to Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:March 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection(s)]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk's Order PLRA Fee]
    Date Published:February 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (42:1983)]
    Date Published:February 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Supplement]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Magistrate Notice/Consent Form]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Provisionally Filing Complaint]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis (42:1983)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint Referred (42:1983)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.arwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?58991
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =