open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

ARKANSAS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas
    Case Number:4:19-bk-16381
    Party Name:John Burton and Melanie Burton
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Summary Notice of Claims Filed]
    Date Published:July 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Document (Misc. Items ONLY i.e. Power of Attorney, Death Certificate, Ballots, etc.)]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order Modify Plan]
    Date Published:June 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order on Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:June 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Hearing Not Held (Courtroom) V3.4]
    Date Published:June 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:May 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:May 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Creditor Request for Notice]
    Date Published:May 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Borrow / Incur]
    Date Published:April 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting Continued]
    Date Published:March 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
    Date Published:March 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Notice of Amd/Cnt/Reschd Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:March 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Meeting of Creditors Continued]
    Date Published:March 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
    Date Published:March 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Ch. 13 Installment Payment]
    Date Published:February 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Chapter 13 Final Payment in FULL]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order on Compensation]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Compensation - Ch. 13 ONLY]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
    Date Published:February 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order to Pay Trustee]
    Date Published:January 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Hearing Continued (Courtroom) V3.4]
    Date Published:January 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [none]
    Date Published:January 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:January 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Notice (only) of Opportunity to Object/Respond to Plan]
    Date Published:January 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:January 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Amended Petition, Schs, Stmts or Creditors (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)]
    Date Published:January 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:January 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order and Notice of Conversion]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [convert case to 13]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williams, Renee S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
    Date Published:January 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williams, Renee S. [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
    Date Published:January 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williams, Renee S. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:January 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williams, Renee S. [Notice of Opportunity to Object/Respond]
    Date Published:December 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williams, Renee S. [convert case 7 to 13]
    Date Published:December 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williams, Renee S. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
    Date Published:December 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williams, Renee S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williams, Renee S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williams, Renee S. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williams, Renee S. [Order of Deficiency]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williams, Renee S. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williams, Renee S. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williams, Renee S. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williams, Renee S. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Application / Motion)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williams, Renee S. [Credit Counseling Certificate]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Application / Motion)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Credit Counseling Certificate]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.areb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?288284
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =