open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

ARKANSAS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas
    Case Number:1:19-cv-01057
    Party Name:Wells v. Holmes
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:June 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:June 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:June 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Scheduling Order - PC cases]
    Date Published:April 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response]
    Date Published:March 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Supplement]
    Date Published:March 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:March 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:March 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:February 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave]
    Date Published:February 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave]
    Date Published:February 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint Referred (42:1983)]
    Date Published:January 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:January 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:December 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Directing Service]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk's Order PLRA Fee]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Magistrate Notice/Consent Form]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (42:1983)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis (42:1983)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint Referred (42:1983)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.arwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?58992
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =