open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

ARKANSAS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas
    Case Number:5:19-cr-50117-1
    Party Name:USA v. Blackwood
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amended Judgment]
    Date Published:May 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Reasons]
    Date Published:May 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:May 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:May 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Sealed Motion]
    Date Published:May 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum]
    Date Published:May 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Document]
    Date Published:May 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:May 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Personal Appearance - CARES Act]
    Date Published:April 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [PSR Sentencing Recommendation - USPO]
    Date Published:March 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Presentence Investigation Report - FINAL]
    Date Published:March 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion for Departure - TLB]
    Date Published:February 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response/Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order re Sentencing Memorandum Due (after Initial PSR) - TLB]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Presentence Investigation Report - INITIAL]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:December 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:December 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:December 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:December 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting/Resetting Hearing on Motion]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Referring Motion]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.arwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?58848
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =