open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

ARKANSAS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas
    Case Number:3:20-bk-13130
    Party Name:Amanda Keefer
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Show Cause Re: Filing Fee]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
    Date Published:August 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Creditor Request for Notice]
    Date Published:August 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:July 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Credit Counseling Certificate]
    Date Published:July 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Credit Counseling Certificate]
    Date Published:July 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:July 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:July 31, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.areb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?292004
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =