open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

ARKANSAS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas
    Case Number:4:20-bk-13591
    Party Name:Tony Kelly
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order on Compensation]
    Date Published:September 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order to Pay Trustee]
    Date Published:September 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:September 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:September 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Financial Management Course (Form 423) - Debtor Education]
    Date Published:September 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:September 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Application / Motion)]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Compensation - Ch. 13 ONLY]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Credit Counseling Certificate]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Application / Motion)]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Compensation - Ch. 13 ONLY]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Credit Counseling Certificate]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.areb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?292480
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =