U.S. District Court for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-po-06129-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Robinson
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Order to Continue]
  • October 24, 2022: [Terminate Hearings]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • October 11, 2022: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • October 11, 2022: [Judge Reassignment]
  • October 04, 2022: [Discovery]
  • October 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 03, 2022: [Citation Issued]
  • October 03, 2022: [Set Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.