U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00310-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Chambers
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 23, 2023: [Pretrial Discovery Order]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order Referring Motion]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order]
  • January 20, 2023: [Continue]
  • January 20, 2023: [Bond]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order of Detention]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order]
  • January 03, 2023: [Memorandum from U.S. Marshal Service]
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Substitute Attorney]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.