U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-50070-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Shamburger, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 03, 2023: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Continue]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 07, 2022: [Bond]
  • December 07, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 07, 2022: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • December 06, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 06, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • December 05, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Video Conference Hearing/CARES Act]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Video Conference Hearing/CARES Act]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • November 30, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 28, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • November 28, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 28, 2022: [Continue]
  • November 22, 2022: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • November 22, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 22, 2022: [Arraignment - TEXT ONLY]
  • November 22, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • November 22, 2022: [Waiver of Personal Appearance - CARES Act]
  • November 21, 2022: [Waiver of Personal Appearance - CARES Act]
  • November 21, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.