U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00305-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hester
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 24, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Pretrial Discovery Order]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 08, 2022: [Continue]
  • December 08, 2022: [Psychiatric Exam]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.