U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-50067-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dixon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 21, 2022: [Continue]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • December 20, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 20, 2022: [Substitute Attorney]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order]
  • December 13, 2022: [Bond]
  • December 06, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • December 02, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 01, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • November 28, 2022: [Arraignment - TEXT ONLY]
  • November 28, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 28, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • November 28, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.