U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-50069-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Farr
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 23, 2023: [Bond]
  • January 23, 2023: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 23, 2023: [Pretrial Report]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 17, 2023: [Continue]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order]
  • January 11, 2023: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order Referring Motion]
  • January 05, 2023: [Release from Custody]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • January 03, 2023: [Substitute Attorney]
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • December 01, 2022: [Arraignment - TEXT ONLY]
  • December 01, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 01, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 01, 2022: [Arrest]
  • December 01, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.