U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-10014-11
  • Case Name: USA v. Walters, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 02, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 03, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 02, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 01, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Probation Petition/Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 24, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 24, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report - FINAL]
  • March 21, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 21, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 21, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • March 20, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • March 20, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • March 06, 2025: [PSR Sentencing Recommendation - USPO]
October, 2024
  • October 15, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 10, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 04, 2024: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 04, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 03, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 20, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearing on Motion]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order Referring Motion]
  • January 17, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 13, 2023: [Notice of Communication from a Represented Party]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • January 09, 2023: [Protective Order]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Motion to Detain]
  • January 06, 2023: [Detain]
  • January 06, 2023: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order]
  • January 06, 2023: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 06, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • January 06, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 06, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 05, 2023: [Pretrial Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.