U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00357-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Titterington et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Judgment of Acquittal]
  • April 09, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • April 01, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Suppress]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • March 13, 2025: [Substitute Attorney]
November, 2024
  • November 19, 2024: [Extension of Time to File Document]
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Order to Unseal Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.