U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:23-cr-00276-26
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 13, 2025: [Revoke - Superseding]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order Referring Motion]
  • May 05, 2025: [Travel]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Travel]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order Referring Motion]
  • April 25, 2025: [Travel]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order Referring Motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 03, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 02, 2025: [Continue]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Pretrial Discovery Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • March 24, 2025: [Memorandum from U.S. Marshal Service]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order Referring Motion]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • March 17, 2025: [Release from Custody]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 12, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 10, 2025: [Continue]
December, 2024
  • December 12, 2024: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2024
  • October 28, 2024: [Order]
  • October 11, 2024: [Continue]
  • October 11, 2024: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Appeal of Magistrate Decision to District Court - Criminal Case]
  • October 09, 2024: [Continue]
  • October 08, 2024: [Pretrial Discovery Order]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order of Detention]
  • October 04, 2024: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court - Criminal Case]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Pretrial Discovery Order]
  • September 26, 2024: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.