U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-50024-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Matthews, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • May 07, 2025: [USCA Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 07, 2025: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • May 06, 2025: [NOA Supplement Form]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • May 05, 2025: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 25, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 21, 2025: [Sentencing]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • March 18, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 18, 2025: [Continue]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Sentencing Memorandum]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 27, 2024: [PSR Sentencing Recommendation - USPO]
  • September 27, 2024: [Presentence Investigation Report - FINAL]
  • September 26, 2024: [Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.