U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-50055-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Caracena-Zarates et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [PSR Sentencing Recommendation - USPO]
  • May 01, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report - FINAL]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order re Sentencing Memorandum Due (after Initial PSR) - TLB]
  • April 24, 2025: [Response/Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 23, 2025: [Response/Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 22, 2025: [Response/Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 18, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report - INITIAL]
  • April 10, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report - INITIAL]
  • April 09, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report - INITIAL]
February, 2025
  • February 13, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 27, 2024: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • September 27, 2024: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • September 27, 2024: [Arraignment - TEXT ONLY]
  • September 26, 2024: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • September 26, 2024: [Warrant Issued]
  • September 26, 2024: [Criminal Cover Sheet]
  • September 26, 2024: [Citation Calendar]
  • September 26, 2024: [Indictment]
  • September 26, 2024: [Pretrial Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.