U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-50026-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Flaherty
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 29, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 28, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report - FINAL]
  • April 24, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 09, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • April 07, 2025: [Leave to File Document ]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report - FINAL]
  • March 31, 2025: [PSR Sentencing Recommendation - USPO]
  • March 25, 2025: [Response/Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order re Sentencing Memorandum Due (after Initial PSR) - TLB]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • March 20, 2025: [Response/Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2025
  • January 12, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 30, 2024: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 27, 2024: [Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.