U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-50038-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2025
  • February 05, 2025: [Response]
December, 2024
  • December 20, 2024: [Response/Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2024
  • October 02, 2024: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 02, 2024: [Change of Plea Hearing]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Order Setting Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 27, 2024: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.