U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00015-4
  • Case Name: USA v. Qualls et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order Referring Motion]
  • May 01, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order Referring Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Order for Summons]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order Referring Motion]
  • October 09, 2024: [Revoke]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Order Referring Motion]
  • September 27, 2024: [Modify Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.