U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:23-cr-60039-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Finkbeiner
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Review of the Ruling of a Magistrate Judge]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • May 05, 2025: [Response/Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 05, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 05, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 03, 2025: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • May 03, 2025: [Arrest]
  • May 02, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Response/Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 17, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 08, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report - INITIAL]
October, 2024
  • October 01, 2024: [In Court Hearing]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Response to Motion]
  • September 30, 2024: [Memorandum Brief in Support]
  • September 30, 2024: [Quash ]
  • September 30, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.