U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-50033-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Deshazo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 07, 2025: [Judgment]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Communication from a Represented Party]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report - FINAL]
  • April 23, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report - FINAL]
  • April 17, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • April 15, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 11, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report - FINAL]
  • March 25, 2025: [PSR Sentencing Recommendation - USPO]
  • March 09, 2025: [Response/Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2024
  • October 01, 2024: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Withdraw as Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.