U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-00151-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dillard
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order Referring Motion]
  • April 23, 2025: [Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order Referring Motion]
  • April 22, 2025: [Withdraw Document]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order Referring Motion]
  • April 21, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order Referring Motion]
  • April 16, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 16, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 10, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order of Detention]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [Pretrial Discovery Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order to Lodge Detainer]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order to Lodge Detainer]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • March 27, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 27, 2025: [Pretrial Discovery Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 21, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 21, 2025: [Pretrial Discovery Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 14, 2025: [Pretrial Discovery Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order to Lodge Detainer]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • March 12, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 12, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order to Unseal Indictment]
  • March 11, 2025: [Withdraw Document]
February, 2025
  • February 20, 2025: [Continue]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 03, 2024: [Continue]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Continue]
  • September 30, 2024: [Substitute Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.