U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cr-30009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Atchley et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Motion for Departure - TLB]
  • May 01, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • May 01, 2025: [Leave to File Document ]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 21, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
October, 2024
  • October 01, 2024: [Order Setting Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 01, 2024: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.