U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cr-50054-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Ellis, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • May 05, 2025: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 04, 2025: [Transmittal Sheet - Appeal]
  • April 04, 2025: [Transcript - Appeal]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
November, 2024
  • November 06, 2024: [Sentencing]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Response/Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order re Sentencing Memorandum Due (after Initial PSR) - TLB]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • October 02, 2024: [Transmittal Sheet - Appeal]
  • October 02, 2024: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • October 01, 2024: [Presentence Investigation Report - INITIAL]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.