U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:23-cr-00007-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Munoz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 01, 2025: [Continue]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2024
  • December 25, 2024: [Continue]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 03, 2024: [Continue]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.