U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-40001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cox, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 23, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 21, 2025: [USCA Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 21, 2025: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [NOA Supplement Form]
  • April 17, 2025: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • April 10, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 10, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 04, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 04, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 03, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 03, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion for Departure]
  • April 03, 2025: [Sentencing]
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
December, 2024
  • December 11, 2024: [Response/Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2024
  • October 02, 2024: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 02, 2024: [Change of Plea Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.