U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-00169-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Siglar et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 05, 2025: [Continue]
April, 2025
  • April 08, 2025: [Order of Detention]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 09, 2024: [Pretrial Discovery Order]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order to Unseal Indictment]
  • October 01, 2024: [Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.