U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-40014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rigsby
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order re Sentencing Memorandum Due after PSR - TEXT ONLY]
  • April 16, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report - FINAL]
  • April 16, 2025: [PSR Sentencing Recommendation - USPO]
  • April 11, 2025: [Response/Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 04, 2025: [Extension of Time]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 28, 2025: [Response/Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 21, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report - INITIAL]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Motion to Detain]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order of Detention]
  • October 10, 2024: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order Referring Motion]
  • October 09, 2024: [Detain]
  • October 07, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 04, 2024: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order of Detention]
  • October 03, 2024: [Detain]
  • October 03, 2024: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order]
  • October 03, 2024: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 03, 2024: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 03, 2024: [Arraignment]
  • October 03, 2024: [Arrest]
  • October 03, 2024: [Case Unsealed]
  • October 02, 2024: [Pretrial Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.