U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-20021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Walker
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Response/Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 24, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 21, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report - INITIAL]
October, 2024
  • October 03, 2024: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 03, 2024: [Bond]
  • October 03, 2024: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order]
  • October 03, 2024: [Arraignment - TEXT ONLY]
  • October 03, 2024: [Case Unsealed]
  • October 03, 2024: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.