U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-10010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Perry
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order Cancelling Deadline ]
  • April 02, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order for Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Test/Pros]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearing on Motion]
  • October 04, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.