U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:23-cr-60029-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Medina-Martinez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • April 18, 2025: [Transmittal Sheet - Appeal]
  • April 18, 2025: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • April 02, 2025: [USCA Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 02, 2025: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [NOA Supplement Form]
  • April 01, 2025: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 26, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 26, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • March 26, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report - FINAL]
November, 2024
  • November 27, 2024: [Presentence Investigation Report - INITIAL]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 07, 2024: [Change of Plea Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.