U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-50050-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Flanagan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 25, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 23, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 08, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 07, 2025: [PSR Sentencing Recommendation - USPO]
  • April 07, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report - FINAL]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Response/Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 26, 2025: [Response/Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order re Sentencing Memorandum Due (after Initial PSR) - TLB]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • March 12, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report - INITIAL]
December, 2024
  • December 01, 2024: [Continue]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order of Detention]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 11, 2024: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 11, 2024: [Arraignment - TEXT ONLY]
  • October 11, 2024: [Arrest]
  • October 11, 2024: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.