U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-50035-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Harper
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 01, 2025: [Transmittal Sheet - Appeal]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • March 25, 2025: [USCA Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 25, 2025: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [NOA Supplement Form]
  • March 24, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 21, 2025: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • March 10, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 10, 2025: [Judgment]
October, 2024
  • October 15, 2024: [Response to Motion]
  • October 11, 2024: [Dismiss]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.