U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-10002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jenkins, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order Referring Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 20, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2025
  • January 20, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.