U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00037-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wilson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 15, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • March 24, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order Referring Motion]
  • March 19, 2025: [Bond]
  • March 10, 2025: [Pretrial Discovery Order]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.