U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cr-00028-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Knight, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Pretrial Discovery Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 11, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Warrant]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order Referring Motion]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order Referring Motion]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 17, 2025: [Warrant]
  • March 12, 2025: [Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.