U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cr-00016-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Lopez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 10, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 10, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 13, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.