U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cr-50021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hamilton, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 24, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • April 21, 2025: [Bond]
  • April 10, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 07, 2025: [Pretrial Report]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order Setting Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order Referring Motion]
  • March 31, 2025: [Reconsideration]
  • March 28, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 28, 2025: [Pretrial Report]
  • March 24, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 14, 2025: [Information to Establish Prior Conviction]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Detain]
  • March 13, 2025: [Detain]
  • March 13, 2025: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 13, 2025: [Release from Custody]
  • March 13, 2025: [Arraignment - TEXT ONLY]
  • March 13, 2025: [Initial Appearance-TEXT ONLY]
  • March 13, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 13, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 13, 2025: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.