U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cr-50020-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lewis-Adams
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 18, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 28, 2025: [Bond]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 27, 2025: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order Referring Motion]
  • March 20, 2025: [Reconsideration]
  • March 19, 2025: [Information to Establish Prior Conviction]
  • March 17, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 14, 2025: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Detain]
  • March 14, 2025: [Detain]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 14, 2025: [Arraignment - TEXT ONLY]
  • March 14, 2025: [Initial Appearance-TEXT ONLY]
  • March 14, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 14, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 14, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.