U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cr-50074-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Rahm
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 24, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 17, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 17, 2025: [Arraignment - TEXT ONLY]
  • April 17, 2025: [Initial Appearance-TEXT ONLY]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 16, 2025: [Criminal Cover Sheet]
  • April 16, 2025: [Citation Calendar]
  • April 16, 2025: [Indictment]
  • April 14, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • April 02, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 17, 2025: [Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.