U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-20012-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Federal Armament, LLC
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Discovery]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 24, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 18, 2025: [Unseal Document]
  • March 18, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.